Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Atterbeary, Cox, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Hill, Kittleman, Luedtke, Pendergrass, Rose, Shoemaker, Terrasa, Washington, and C. Watson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain contract of a county superintendent of schools or a certain chief executive officer, executed on or after June 1, 2020, to include a provision that if the contract is terminated, the maximum cash settlement may not exceed certain amounts; prohibiting a certain cash settlement from including any compensation other than cash, subject to a certain exception; prohibiting a county superintendent or chief executive officer who is removed under certain circumstances from being compensated in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0709 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-201, 4-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page