Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Moon, Angel, Barron, Ebersole, Fennell, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Sanchez, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2017; and altering a specified limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2017.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0522 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page