Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Aumann, Carozza, Ciliberti, Ghrist, Hornberger, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, Long, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Szeliga, Vitale, Vogt, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except in specified circumstances, the performance or inducement or attempted performance or inducement of an abortion unless a determination as to the probable age of the unborn child is made by a specified physician; providing that the failure of a physician to perform specified actions is deemed unprofessional conduct; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0283 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   20-217 through 20-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page