Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Anderson, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Gibson, Hettleman, Hill, Lam, McComas, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Rey, Sanchez, Jackson, Gutierrez, Valentino-Smith, Krimm, P. Young, Vogt, Haynes, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Chang
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to conduct a third-party audit of certain sexual assault cases; requiring a county or municipality to arrange a third-party audit of sexual assault cases when the percentage of unfounded sexual assault cases exceeds by 5% or more a certain national average; establishing the requirements for a third-party audit of sexual assault cases; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish and maintain guidelines for third-party audits of sexual assault cases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0583
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0260 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714866/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {714866/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page