Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Pena-Melnyk, B. Barnes, Beidle, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Jalisi, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring drivers approaching from the rear certain vehicles that are stopped, standing, or parked on a highway and using certain visual signals to make a lane change to an available lane not immediately adjacent to the stopped, standing, or parked vehicle under certain circumstances, or to slow to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe for certain existing conditions under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
(   21-405, 22-201, 22-218, 22-218.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page