Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Afzali, Barve, Brooks, Clippinger, Cluster, Cullison, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, McDonough, Miele, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, Stein, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a renewal application for a continuing care retirement community by requiring that actuarial studies reviewed by qualified actuaries be submitted at least every 3 years for specified providers, and every 5 years for specified continuing care agreements; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0282 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-401, 10-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page