Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters relating to the local economic impact of opening new credit unions or banks within a 1-mile radius of bank deserts in the State and within a 1-mile radius of Coppin State University campus; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983099/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-45)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of a Bank Near Coppin State University
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {983099/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-45) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Finance 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page