Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Household Goods Movers Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Bagnall, Bartlett, Branch, Carey, Chang, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Fennell, Lisanti, McIntosh, Sample-Hughes, C. Watson, Wilson, and Howard
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services using a certain commercial motor vehicle in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; establishing certain requirements and procedures for the registration of household goods movers under the Act; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0712
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613593/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-24)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Household Goods Movers Registration
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {613593/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Household Goods Movers Registration
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (110-24) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text - Chapter - Household Goods Movers Registration
(   8.5-101 through 8.5-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page