Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Morales, Branch, Cullison, Davis, Glenn, C. Howard, Korman, A. Miller, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Sanchez, A. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in conjunction with the State Department of Education, to recommend best practices for county boards of education to provide to students specified needs assessments and specified behavioral health counseling services; providing that county boards may not be required to provide specified assessments or counseling services; prohibiting specified insurance policies or contracts from denying a covered medically necessary behavioral health care service for a specified student; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Individualized Counseling Services - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745265/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {983327/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Individualized Counseling Services - Requirements
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {745265/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {983327/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {534636/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text - Chapter - Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment
(   7-440 )
(   15-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page