Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Angel, B. Barnes, Beitzel, Brooks, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fennell, Gibson, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Wilkins, P. Young, Ali, D. Barnes, Hornberger, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without certain qualifying children to claim the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; and making the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0647
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0002 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {229036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {305563/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Alteration of Minimum Age Requirement
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {229036/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text - Chapter -
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page