Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the limit, from $20,000 to $30,000, that the Maryland Home Improvement Commission can award from the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund to one claimant for certain acts or omissions of one contractor.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0467
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-23)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 46-0
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (109-23) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed 46-0 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:15 PM
Click to return on the top page