Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Pendergrass, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators to be the State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators; establishing a licensing and regulatory system for assisted living managers under the Board; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality, beginning October 1, 2024, to notify the Board of the appointment of an assisted living program as a resident's representative payee; establishing a civil penalty for certain actions related to practicing as a nursing home administrator or an assisted living manager without a license; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0720
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0480 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {243324/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {973829/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Floor Amendment {243324/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Text - Chapter - State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page