Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Luedtke, Turner, Guyton, Palakovich Carr, Ivey, Patterson, Feldmark, Mosby, Washington, Ebersole, Wilkins, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the categories of individuals who are authorized to be employed or contracted to provide education services for a 10-month or 2-month period with a salary commensurate with the period of employment; extending the date for a certain workgroup to convene and analyze the results of the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to January 1, 2020; charging the workgroup with identifying reforms highlighted by the pilot program and academic research on best practices on education in institutional settings; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-25)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {665863/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-25) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   6-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page