Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Barron, Carey, Dumais, Gaines, Gilchrist, Healey, Jackson, Kaiser, Krimm, Lehman, McComas, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Reznik, and Solomon
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain recipients of State funds to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area if the assembly area uses or requires the use of a public address system and a state contract has been executed; authorizing certain recipients of State funds to apply for a waiver from the requirement of a certain provision of the Act; requiring that the waiver request include a certain description; establishing the Hearing Accessibility Advisory Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244864/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {244864/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text - Chapter - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page