Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Walker, Smith, Guyton, Cain, Wilkins, Ebersole, Mosby, Turner, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, and Feldmark
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Board of Restorative Practices in Schools to study and analyze disciplinary policies and restorative practices in State public schools; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Board; providing that the term of a selected member is 4 years; providing for staggered terms of selected members; requiring the Board to make recommendations regarding legislative and budgetary proposals for policies that reduce the school-to-prison pipeline and to report to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Haynes) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-26)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {545863/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Haynes) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (113-26) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   7-304.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page