Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on and after January 1, 2024, a certain governmental unit to designate at least one individual licensed by the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors to be in responsible charge of certain land surveying and property line surveying activities practiced by or on behalf of the governmental unit.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page