Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement and use of a speed monitoring system at the intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue in Talbot County, subject to placement and signage requirements; requiring the fines collected by the Town of Oxford as a result of the speed monitoring system to be used to assist in covering the cost of roadway and pedestrian safety improvements in and around the intersection; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1132 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-26)
Proceedings
36AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223725/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-26) 36AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page