Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Reznik, Barve, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Ebersole, Healey, Jones, Krimm, Lafferty, Luedtke, McIntosh, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Stein, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the circumstances under which a broadband Internet access service provider may handle certain customer personal information in a certain manner; establishing a mechanism through which a broadband Internet access service provider may obtain customer consent to have certain personal information handled in a certain manner; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that if the State or a municipality provides broadband Internet services, they may not impose use restrictions that prohibit the exercise of free speech; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663397/1
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673429/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-46)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {663397/1 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {673429/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (86-46) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-4101 through 14-4109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page