Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Clippinger, Cullison, Haynes, Hixson, C. Howard, Kaiser, Korman, McIntosh, A. Miller, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, Rosenberg, Turner, and Vallario
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing and withdrawing specified applications to Congress to call a Constitutional Convention; and urging the legislatures of specified other states to repeal and withdraw such applications.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0002
Introduced in a prior session as: HJ0006 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-47)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {633123/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-47) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page