Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a minor to file a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry in the minor's own name in the Circuit Court for the county in which the minor resides; extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry; authorizing an individual who is 17 years old to marry under certain circumstances; requiring an applicant for a marriage license to provide a certain document to a clerk of the court; prohibiting a person under the age of 17 from marrying; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0173 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/23/2021
Legislative Date
7/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/23/2021 7/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page