Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Integrity Act
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain agent of a voter to be a family member or member of the voter's household to pick up and deliver the voter's absentee ballot; prohibiting a certain campaign volunteer from being designated by a voter as a certain agent to pick up and deliver an absentee ballot; and prohibiting a certain agent of a voter from picking up and delivering more than three absentee ballots during each election.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0690
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Absentee Voting – Use of an Agent – Agent Requirements and Prohibitions
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page