Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Elfreth, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Smith, Washington, West, and Zirkin
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the date, to on or before December 31, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to prepare a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species, subject to available funding; continuing the prohibition on a person sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a certain cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until the Department prepares a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0213
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-7)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964532/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (127-7) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page