Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the basis for calculating a specified license fee credited to the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; and extending the deadline from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2019, by which the owner of a specified eligible heating oil tank may apply for reimbursement of specified costs from the Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text - Chapter - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
(   4-411, 4-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page