Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Waldstreicher, and Washington
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in organized contests that have the objective of killing a coyote, fox, or raccoon for prizes or monetary awards except under certain circumstances; and establishing a fine of $100 for each coyote, fox, or raccoon killed in violation of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0293
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/01/2020
Legislative Date
8/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790313/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/01/2020 8/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {104239/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {790313/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Refuses Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 House Refuses Recede 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page