Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Sheriff of Garrett County to establish a pretrial release program that offers alternatives to pretrial detention and adopt certain regulations; authorizing a court to order a certain individual to participate in the pretrial release program; authorizing the court to make the order at a certain time; providing for eligibility for the pretrial release program; authorizing the Sheriff to establish and direct a certain work release program; authorizing the Sheriff to establish and administer a home detention program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0407
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1124 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judiciary 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Text - Chapter - Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page