Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from taking certain actions related to the payment of fees in cases of certain loans made to consumer borrowers; and authorizing, under certain circumstances, a person to require a borrower to pay a fee for the transaction of a payment made by or on behalf of the borrower in cases of certain loans made to consumer borrowers.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-1005.1, 12-108.1, 12-307.2, 12-405.1, 12-905.1 )
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 7:07 PM
Click to return on the top page