Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Bailey, Cassilly, Eckardt, Gallion, Klausmeier, Lee, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; exempting certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment for up to 18 months or a fine of up to $5,000 or both; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0368
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0406 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {253521/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {593625/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Floor Amendment {253521/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Floor Amendment {593625/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-211.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page