Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pinsky, Astle, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to use specified money from the Bay Restoration Fund to assist a person in paying the cost difference between a conventional on-site sewage disposal system and a system utilizing nitrogen removal technology in a specified order of priority; requiring the Bay Cabinet, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Commission and other interested parties, to review specified matters; requiring the Bay Cabinet to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Rejected (22-23)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider the favorable report (Senator Currie) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Currie) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) Withdrawn
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion (Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {703927/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-18)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Rejected (22-23) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Motion Reconsider the favorable report (Senator Currie) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Currie) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) Withdrawn 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion (Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Middleton) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {703927/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {253122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (27-18) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-1108, 9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page