- Title
- Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
- Sponsored by
- The President (By Request - Administration)
- Status
- In the House - Passed Enrolled
- Analysis
- Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering or repealing certain required appropriations; authorizing the use of certain funds for certain purposes; altering, from December 1, 2024, to January 15, 2027, the date by which the Accountability and Implementation Board has to conduct and submit a certain independent evaluation; altering the sales and use tax rate on certain electronic smoking devices; repealing a certain small business relief tax credit; requiring interest earnings for certain special funds to accrue to the General Fund of the State during certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
- Opposite:
- Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0352
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Toggle History Dropdown
File Code
Toggle Filecode Dropdown
Subjects
Toggle Subjects Dropdown
Statutes
Toggle Statutes Dropdown
Last Updated: 4/26/2024 8:53 AM