Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Smith, Hough, Lee, Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a facility operated by the Maryland Department of Health is required to receive and evaluate an inmate in a correctional facility who has been certified for involuntary admission; authorizing a court, if the Department fails to admit an inmate to a designated State facility within 8 days of a certain notification, to impose any sanction reasonably designed to compel compliance with the Act; requiring a certain report to be submitted yearly to certain legislative committees by October 31; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0306
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {307079/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page