Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bates, Kagan, Salling, Waugh, Young, Zucker, Conway, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Robinson, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs to refer eligible veterans who inquire about participation in the Program to one or more nonprofit training entities and encourage successful Program participants to assist in outreach to potential participants; requiring the Department to select at least one nonprofit entity to implement a training protocol, select participants, and provide services to specified veterans; establishing the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243522/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {214235/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {243522/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {626087/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text - Chapter - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page