Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Guzzone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain restrooms in certain public buildings and certain places of public accommodation; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; requiring certain standards to be filed with the Secretary of State; requiring that certain bodies be responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
(   20-301, 20-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page