Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate a specified portion of highway in Baltimore County as the Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page