Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Ellis, Klausmeier, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain hospitals and health systems to provide each patient with a written notice that includes certain information related to facility fees that are charged for outpatient services provided at hospital-based facilities; requiring that each initial billing statement to a patient from a hospital or health system that includes a facility fee include certain information; requiring that a certain written notice be provided to certain patients in a certain manner and at a certain time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-349.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page