Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Guzzone, Kramer, Rosapepe, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing in the development of a cosmetic beginning October 1, 2020; prohibiting a person from selling, offering for sale, or transporting within the State certain cosmetics beginning October 1, 2021; providing for certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; requiring a certain court to consider certain information in making a certain determination regarding the amount of a civil penalty; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
(   21-1215, 21-259.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page