Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Lee, Astle, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, under specified circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; requiring the court to stay further proceedings in a termination of parental rights action under specified circumstances; authorizing the court to stay or postpone a trial on termination of parental rights for good cause; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0428
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282012/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Hough)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Hough)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {708275/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {282012/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Hough) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Hough) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Vallario and B. Wilson) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1401 through 5-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page