Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to serve children in the juvenile services system with programming that provides females with services and programs to meet their specific needs, including diversion programs, community detention services and programs, and reentry services and programs; altering the duties of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include consulting with and advising the Secretary of the Department on the treatment and programming needs of females in the juvenile justice system; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0721
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718778/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {718778/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
(   9-215, 9-238.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page