Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Ferguson, Beidle, Washington, Feldman, Jackson, Guzzone, Griffith, Eckardt, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund to be the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund; altering the purpose of the Fund to include making grants to federally qualified health centers, hospitals, and certain providers to increase access to prenatal care, which may include behavioral and oral health services; altering the proposals from counties or municipalities that are required to receive priority in the awarding of grants; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {569735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {453420/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (40-92)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-22)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {569735/1 Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Floor Amendment {453420/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (40-92) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (111-22) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page