Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, Mathias, and Oaks
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; authorizing the Commission to provide specified reports to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Maryland Congressional Delegation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {973926/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-86)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-49)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {777074/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Economic Matters 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {973926/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-86) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-49) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Text - Chapter - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page