Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Benson, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Middleton, Peters, Young, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, and Serafini
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Education Development Collaborative for specified purposes to include activities to promote and enhance 21st-century learning and socioeconomic diversity in the State's public schools; providing that the Collaborative is an instrumentality of the State; establishing a Governing Board of the Collaborative; requiring the Board to establish an Advisory Council to provide advice on matters relating to 21st-century learning, data collection and sharing, and other specified issues; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {639931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {265564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {723825/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-44)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {639931/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {265564/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {723825/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-44) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Text - Chapter - Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
(   9.7-101 through 9.7-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page