Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Augustine, Ellis, Griffith, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt certain regulations on or before December 31, 2019, to require the qualification of a business as a small business under certain circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0284
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684936/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {684936/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page