Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Payroll Recovery Act
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Astle, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish specified pay periods and pay each employee all wages due at least once every 2 weeks or twice a month; requiring each appointing authority to calculate and report specified payroll information to the Central Payroll Bureau; requiring each appointing authority to provide to each employee a notice of specified information; requiring the Bureau to provide each employee a statement, each pay period, that includes specified information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497074/1
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Payroll Recovery Act
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {497074/1 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Brochin) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Miller) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Payroll Recovery Act
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-402, 2-402, 2-406, 2-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page