Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB1378 - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse
Judiciary 3/11/2025 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 4/4/2025 3:00:00 PM
As of: 4/15/2025 2:40:30 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delegate Wilson, Delegate Wilson | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Yost, Thomas | The Yost Legal Group | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
O'Brien, Cara | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Jordan, Lisae C | Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) | INFO |
In Person - Oral Testimony St-lim - window for state claims - testimony - ho |
JUD |
Delegate Wilson, Delegate Wilson | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Yost, Thomas | The Yost Legal Group | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Brown, Anthony | Office of the Attorney General | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Flynn, Ellen | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony Guilty plea testimony Late testimony |
JUD | |
Cody, Annice | Holy Cross Health | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Gardner, Kenneth | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Harris, Antoine | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Phelps Jr, Ken | The Episcopal Diocese of Maryland | FAV | No Testimony | JUD |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 HB1378 Testimony Against 2025-03-26.pdf | JUD | |
O'Brien, Cara | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Tibbals, Trudy | UNF | No Testimony | JUD | |
Mathias, Sam | Maryland Association of Boards of Education | FWA | HB 1378 - CVA Time Limit - SWA.pdf | JUD |
Thronson, Patrick | Maryland Association for Justice | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony MAJ position paper HB 1378.pdf |
JUD |
Kraska, Jenny | FWA | MD Catholic Conference_HB1378_FWA.pdf | JUD | |
Goldberg, Jonathan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Natale, Frank | Slater Slater Schulman | UNF | No Testimony | JUD |
Kahn, Joshua | Schochor, Staton, Goldberg and Cardea, P.A. | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Doe, John | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Williams, Jubi | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Jordan, Lisae C | Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony St-lim - window for state claims - testimony - ho |
JUD |
Matthews, Todd | Bailey & Glasser, LLP | UNF | HB1378.pdf | JUD |
Stern, Corey | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Snyder, Rebecca | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony MDDC FWA HB1378.pdf |
JUD | |
Callender, Nia | PSSAM | FWA | HB 1378 - Child Sexual Abuse Claims Against the St | JUD |
Brantley, Sandra | Office of Counsel to the General Assembly | INFO | Letter of Advice | JUD |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2025 at 257 PM | JUD | |
Pauli, James | MSBA | FAV | Late testimony | JUD |
Delegate Wilson, Delegate Wilson | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Yost, Thomas | The Yost Legal Group | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR |
Stern, Corey | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Malarkey, Emily | Maryland Association for Justice | UNF |
April 4 2025 HB1378 Unfavorable.pdf
April 4 2025 HB1378 Unfavorable.pdf April 4 2025 HB1378 Unfavorable.pdf |
JPR |
Figueras, Chris | Maryland Association for Justice | UNF | MAJ position paper HB 1378.pdf | JPR |
Lancaster, Teresa | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Lorenz, David | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 4-4-2025 at 238 PM | JPR | |
Diaz, Mary Beth | None | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR |
Flynn, Ellen | UNF | Vincent Pennix, SR Testimony.pdf | JPR | |
Kahn, Joshua | Schochor, Staton, Goldberg and Cardea, P.A. | UNF | HB 1378 - Kahn Testimony to Senate Judicial Procee | JPR |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools