Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0647 - Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report

Budget and Taxation 2/17/2021 1:00:00 PM
Appropriations 3/30/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 6/16/2021 4:53:35 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator King, Senator King FAV Oral Testimony B&T
Fry, Donald Greater Baltimore Committee FAV SB0647. 02.17.21Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding.Re B&T
Reynolds, Todd FAV COVIDReliefReportingAct--AFTsupport.pdf B&T
King, Senator Nancy FAV Oral Testimony
SB647 Sponsor Testimony.pdf
B&T
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-02-17 SB 647 (Support).pdf B&T
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-17-2021 at 1149 AM B&T
Senator King, Senator King FAV Oral Testimony APP
Fry, Donald Greater Baltimore Committee FAV SB0647 - 03.30.21 (in House)--Federal COVID-19 Rel APP
King, Senator Nancy FAV SB647 King House Sponsor Testimony.pdf APP
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-03-30 (Crossover) SB 647 (Support).pdf APP
mcavoy, vince FWA SB647 Favorable with Amendment.pdf APP
Click to return on the top page