Day(s)
As of: 5/11/2025 11:09:01 AM
Canceled
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by MSDE on Payments to Grantees
Created: 1/30/2023 4:32 PM
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
Sen West
Recordation Tax – Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust – Extent of Exemption
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
Sens Elfreth and Zucker
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Adoption Expenses - Alterations
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
Sen Guzzone
Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Judicial Proceedings)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
Sens Guzzone and Salling
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas in Baltimore County - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2023 9:34 AM)
Created: 1/17/2023 11:52 AM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland Family Network
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:59 PM)
Briefing by the Maryland Family Network and MSDE on Child Care in the State
(Removed - 1/20/2023 1:59 PM)
Created: 1/15/2023 6:46 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Energy Policy Overview: Public Service Commission and PJM Interconnection
Created: 1/19/2023 1:15 PM
2:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Feldman
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sen Augustine
Land Use – Public Service Companies – Pollinator–Friendly Vegetation Management
Sen Feldman
Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
(Removed - 1/25/2023 11:36 AM)
Created: 1/11/2023 12:38 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations – Clinical and Graduate Alcohol and Drug Counselors – Licensure
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
Sen Jackson
Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Sen Lam
HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
(Removed - 1/25/2023 10:17 AM)
Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Bailey
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions
Sen Beidle
Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
(Added - 1/17/2023 2:07 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Sen Carter
Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing (Assurance of Child's Safety Act)
Created: 1/13/2023 4:45 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Del B. Barnes
Victim Services Programs – Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Judiciary)
(Added - 1/24/2023 10:39 AM)
Del Korman
Transportation – Maryland Rail Authority – Establishment (Maryland Rail Investment Act of 2023)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 1/17/2023 9:51 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
Del Bagnall, et al
State Personnel - Whistleblower Law - Procedures and Remedies (First Amendment and Public Employee Protection Act)
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
Created: 1/27/2023 4:19 PM
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Office of Policy Analysis
DLS Fiscal Briefing
Created: 1/26/2023 12:24 PM
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Labor
Division of Unemployment Insurance
Created: 1/16/2023 4:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by Maryland Department of Natural Resources
Briefing by Maryland Department of Transportation
Created: 1/13/2023 10:59 AM
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Stewart
Housing Innovation Pilot Program and Housing Innovation Fund - Establishment (Housing Innovation Pilot Program Act of 2023)
Del Holmes
Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
Created: 1/10/2023 3:37 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Procurement 101 and Cybersecurity 101
Created: 1/27/2023 9:55 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 214
Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Fraser-Hidalgo
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Del Pippy
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Dels Moon and Williams
Controlled Dangerous Substances – Volume Dealers and Drug Kingpins – Cannabis
(Removed - 1/30/2023 10:09 AM)
Created: 1/17/2023 10:49 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Rosenberg
Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:05 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:05 PM)
Del Palakovich Carr, et al
Cryptocurrency - Campaign Finance Prohibitions - Disclosures by Financial Institutions
(Added - 1/19/2023 1:58 PM)
Del R. Long
Homestead Property Tax Credit – Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First–Time Homebuyer
Created: 1/17/2023 2:07 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
AIB Advisory Committee Pillar 3
Meeting Video
NOTE: The Agenda and Meeting Materials will be posted prior to the meeting. To review click here
Meeting Video
NOTE: The Agenda and Meeting Materials will be posted prior to the meeting. To review click here
Quarterly Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools