Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 9:32:31 AM
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Sen McCray
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sen Peters
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
(Added - 1/20/2021 4:47 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 4:47 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 4:47 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 4:47 PM)
Sen Kagan
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
(Removed - 1/27/2021 5:57 PM)
Created: 1/19/2021 12:36 PM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Created: 1/6/2021 1:48 PM
2:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 1/19/2021 12:36 PM)
(Added - 1/19/2021 12:36 PM)
Sens Hester and Simonaire
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
(Added - 1/19/2021 12:36 PM)
Sen Kagan
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
(Added - 1/19/2021 12:36 PM)
Sen Simonaire
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
(Added - 1/18/2021 3:32 PM)
Sens West and Feldman
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Sen Griffith, et al
Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Gallion, et al
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
Sen Augustine
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sen Washington
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sen Hough, et al
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sen Beidle
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sen Waldstreicher
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sen Hettleman, et al
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sen Hettleman
Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Health Care Providers - Definition and Immunity (Maryland Health Care Heroes Protection Act)
Created: 1/22/2021 1:53 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/19/2021 3:44 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Ways and Means)
Del Valentino-Smith
Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Establishment
Created: 1/29/2021 3:53 PM
5:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
Created: 1/22/2021 10:51 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
-Briefing on COVID-19 Vaccine Distribution
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del Cullison
Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
(Added - 1/21/2021 4:03 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2021 4:03 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 1/21/2021 4:03 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2021 4:03 PM)
Del Ivey
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
Created: 1/29/2021 2:57 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 14, HB 34, HB 191
Created: 1/29/2021 4:00 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 28, 78, 309
Created: 1/18/2021 6:30 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. All bills will be given three (3) minutes to the sponsor and two (2) minutes for each witness.
Del Pippy
Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
Del Moon
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Del Rosenberg
First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property
Created: 1/18/2021 9:16 AM
1:30 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del McKay
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Del Mangione
Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
Del Boyce
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Del Long
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Del Long
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Del Acevero
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Del Guyton
Election Law - Voting Locations - Accessibility by Public Transportation and Voters With Disabilities
Del Hornberger
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Local Alcohol Bill Hearings
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools