Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:05:36 PM
Created: 2/2/2021 4:56 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
These bills are being heard before the Pensions Subcommittee
(Added - 2/3/2021 5:27 PM)
Sen Elfreth (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Created: 2/2/2021 4:56 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearings, Work Session, and Voting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/2/2021 7:51 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:30 to 1:30 p.m.
Sen Simonaire
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Envelope Prohibitions, Ballot Status Information, and Signature Verification
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Pinsky and Guzzone
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen McCray
Baltimore City - Centralized Booking Facility - Voting Information and Early Voting Polling Place
Sens Pinsky and Kramer
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sen McCray, et al
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program
(Added - 2/10/2021 2:55 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 10:34 AM)
Sen Jackson
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
(Added - 2/10/2021 2:55 PM)
Sen Carozza, et al
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
(Added - 1/29/2021 10:34 AM)
Created: 2/15/2021 4:02 PM
10:00 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
9:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/18/2021 1:18 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/18/2021 4:14 PM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/16/2021 4:13 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/17/2021 5:09 PM
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
3:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Subcommittee will be voting after the budget hearing. Start time may vary.
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/17/2021 5:03 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Human Services – Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program – Heat and Eat Program
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/3/2021 10:34 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 2/4/2021 10:40 AM)
Dels Brooks and Barve
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Del Brooks
Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 2/4/2021 10:40 AM)
Del D.E. Davis
Natural Gas – Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement – Surcharge and Plans
(Removed - 2/15/2021 6:08 PM)
Created: 1/29/2021 10:46 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Dorchester County Delegation
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
(Added - 2/2/2021 1:13 PM)
(Added - 2/4/2021 3:59 PM)
Del Wells
Maryland Transit Administration - Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Center Patients - Modifications
(Added - 2/4/2021 3:59 PM)
Del Wells
Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Modifications
(Added - 2/4/2021 3:59 PM)
(Added - 2/4/2021 3:59 PM)
Created: 1/21/2021 3:05 PM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
Created: 2/2/2021 7:48 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del Charles
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Certification – Revisions
Del K. Young
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:58 PM)
Del Kerr
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Created: 2/15/2021 9:53 AM
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
12:15 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 135, 182
(Added - 2/15/2021 2:44 PM)
- HB 135
(Removed - 2/15/2021 2:44 PM)
Created: 1/31/2021 9:37 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each sponsor will be given three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will be given two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
Del Arikan
Child Care Providers - Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden's Law)
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
Del Dumais
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
Del Rosenberg
Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/6/2021 5:35 PM)
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Del Buckel
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
(Added - 2/6/2021 5:35 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2021 5:35 PM)
Del McKay
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:18 PM)
Del Palakovich Carr
Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Del Smith
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution
Del Washington
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:18 PM)
Dels Lierman and Korman
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
Note: This bill may be discussion only.
(Removed - 2/17/2021 11:33 AM)
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting