Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:06:47 PM
Created: 2/25/2021 11:06 AM
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kagan
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sen Elfreth, et al
Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
(Added - 2/26/2021 9:57 AM)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/25/2021 2:27 PM
9:30 AM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
9:45 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Elfreth, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Elfreth and Bailey
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sen Pinsky, et al
Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Griffith
Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
Sen Eckardt
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
Created: 1/27/2021 10:06 AM
Thursday, February 18, 2021
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc), et al
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
(Removed - 2/17/2021 10:55 AM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
SB877 - Corrective
SB878 - Curative
Sponsor hearings of bills for referral
Created: 2/24/2021 6:28 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/25/2021 11:32 AM
12:00 PM to 1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/24/2021 10:00 PM
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment - Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
Del Boyce
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Dels Love and Henson
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
The Spkr (Admin)
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Created: 2/7/2021 1:36 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting - Prince George's County PG 402-21
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Bridges
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Hartman
Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
(Removed - 2/17/2021 1:54 PM)
Dels Cardin and Crutchfield
District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
Del Dumais
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
- HB 670
Del Adams
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal
Del Sample-Hughes
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Del D. Barnes
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
Del Ebersole
Baltimore County – Board of Education – Oversight by the Baltimore County Office of the Inspector General
(Removed - 2/18/2021 8:18 AM)
County Delegation Meeting
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session
Special Guest: U.S. Senator Ben Cardin
(Added - 2/25/2021 11:36 AM)
Briefing by the Baltimore County Executive
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB1094
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Voting Session: HB45, HB1141
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB913, HB1094, HB1197
(Removed - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Voting Session
(Removed - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Created: 2/23/2021 3:56 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Updates
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders
Delegation Meeting