Day(s)
As of: 5/30/2023 5:07:03 PM
Canceled
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance
Created: 1/13/2021 5:14 PM
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 3/1/2021 3:53 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
CyberSecurity Workgroup
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance
Created: 1/13/2021 5:14 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Canceled
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Voting Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Voting session will take place at 5pm or following budget hearings.
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/26/2021 2:52 PM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Korman
Public Utilities – Office of Climate Counsel – Establishment (Climate Counsel Act)
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Del Bhandari
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Del Lierman, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Del Charkoudian
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Wilson
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Del Brooks
Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Del Qi
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 3/1/2021 2:43 PM)
Del Conaway
Business Regulation – Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions – Conversion of Interest Into Fees
Del Conaway
Business Regulation - Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions - Limitation on Conversion of Interest to Fees
Created: 2/25/2021 11:40 AM
11:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/26/2021 2:54 PM
3:30 PM to 4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/26/2021 1:45 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hill, et al
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Charles
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Certification – Revisions
Created: 2/5/2021 4:04 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they are listed below. Each bill sponsor will be given three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will be given two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
Dels Stein and Bartlett
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
- HB 670
Created: 2/24/2021 9:38 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HBs: 88, 128, 231, 234, 270
(Added - 2/27/2021 9:13 AM)
Agenda to come.
(Removed - 2/27/2021 9:13 AM)
Del Buckel
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
Del D. Jones
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Del Shoemaker
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Del McKay
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
Created: 2/26/2021 12:56 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
This work session is regrding HB 940.
Workgroup regarding HB940
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session
Frederick County Delegation Meeting
Created: 12/7/2020 2:25 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet virtually to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.
Created: 2/26/2021 5:52 PM
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Phone Dial in: 1-414-882-6578
PIN: 382 219 940#
PIN: 382 219 940#
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board Meeting
Canceled
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.