Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/24/2022 7:08:07 PM
Thursday, March 3, 2022
House
Created: 2/8/2022 2:20 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education PG 503-22
PLEASE NOTE: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
PLEASE NOTE: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Guyton

Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Composition - Alteration
Del Lisanti

County Boards of Education - Community Ombudsman - Established
Del Boteler, et al

Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Del Boteler, et al

Education - Public Schools - Instruction in Print and Cursive Handwriting
Del Boteler, et al

Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
Del Guyton

More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2022
Del Lierman

Public Schools – Student Athletics – Requirements and Reports (Elijah Gorham Act)
Howard County Delegation

Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
PLEASE NOTE: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Luedtke

County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Del Reznik

Education - Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program - School Lunch
Del J. Lewis, et al

Education - Collective Bargaining - Certificated Employees - Class Size
Dels Wilkins and Charles

Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Del Ghrist, et al

Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Del Szeliga

Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Del Ruth

Education - Maryland Homeschool Advisory Council - Establishment
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
(Removed - 2/17/2022 6:08 PM)
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County - Board of Education - Curriculum Publication
(Removed - 3/1/2022 10:09 AM)

Education Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 3/1/2022 1:40 PM
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County Board of Education – Student Member – Voting
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22
Dels Ebersole and Forbes

Baltimore County – Board of Education – Member Appointments and Terms and Election of Officers
Del Ebersole, et al

Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Del Feldmark, et al

Education - Student Athletes - Uniform Modifications for Modesty (Inclusive Athletic Attire Act)
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation and Student Representative
Dels D. Jones and Kaiser

Student Data Privacy - Protections, Digital Tools, and Student Data Privacy Council
Del Qi, et al

Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
PLEASE NOTE: This bill is for discussion only.
Del Acevero

Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education
PLEASE NOTE: This bill is for discussion only.
Dels Valderrama and Qi

Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement
PLEASE NOTE: This bill is for discussion only.
Del Walker, et al

Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
(Added - 3/3/2022 9:01 AM)

Click to return on the top page